Bandaru Dattatreya
Constituency: Secunderabad
Party: Bharatiya Janata Party
Father"s Name: Shri B. Anjiah
Date of Birth: Thursday, June 12, 1947
Birth Place: Hyderabad (Andhra Pradesh)
Marital Status: Married
Spouse Name: Smt. Vasantha
State Name: Telangana
Permanent Address: Ram Nagar,Hyderabad, Telangana
Present Address: A.P. Bhawan,New Delhi - 110001
Email Id: bandaru[at]sansad[dot]nic[dot]in
Education Qualifications: B.Sc. Educated at Osmania University, Hyderabad (Andhra Pradesh)
1980 | Secretary, Bharatiya Janata Party (B.J.P.), Andhra Pradesh |
1981-89 | General-Secretary, B.J.P., Andhra Pradesh |
1991 | Elected to 10th Lok Sabha |
1996-98 | Member, Public Accounts Committee |
1998 | Member, Committee on Welfare of SCs, STs and Minorities |
1998-99 | President, B.J.P., Andhra Pradesh |
1999 | Re-elected to 12th Lok Sabha (2nd term) |
13 Oct. 1999 - 13 June 2000 | Union Minister of State, Urban Development |
14 June 2000 - 30 June 2002 | Re-elected to 13th Lok Sabha (3rd term) |
1 July 2002- 7 Sept. 2003 | Union Minister of State, Ministry of Urban Development |
8 Sept. 2003 | Union Minister of State, Ministry of Urban Development and Poverty Alleviation |
May, 2014 | Union Minister of State, Ministry of Railways |
1 Sep. 2014 - 9 Nov. 2014 | Union Minister of State (Independent Charge), Ministry of Urban Development and Poverty Alleviation |
09 Nov. 2014 onwards | Re-elected to 16th Lok Sabha (4th term) |
Social and Cultural Activities: Slum development, especially through housebuilding and supply of potable water; President, Samsakara Bharathi Cultural Organisation, Andhra Pradesh; Founder, Siva Bharathi Slum Development Organisation, 1979; served the victims of cyclones and natural calamities; organised social and cultural activities through voluntary organisations; interested in mythological songs Social work
Sports and Clubs: Carrom, table tennis and cricket
Favourite Pastimes and Recreation: Reading and listening to music
Other Information: General Secretary, Voluntary Organisations, India; Joint Secretary, A.P. Cyclone Committee (RSS); Member, (i) Tobacco Board, 1991-96; (ii) Coconut Board, 1991-96; (iii) Railway Advisory Committee, 1991-96; and (iv) Telephone Advisory Committee, 1991-96